Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Spending - Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Olszewski
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to provide a report to the State Department of Education by specified dates on the amount of State, local, and federal funds spent per student for specified students at each school; requiring the Department to submit a specified report to the General Assembly by specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0926 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM