Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Acupuncture Board - Disciplinary Procedures - Judicial Appeals and Prohibition on Stays
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell (By Request - Departmental - State Acupuncture Board)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a hearing of charges filed by the State Acupuncture Board from being stayed or challenged by specified procedural defects; prohibiting an order of the Board from being stayed pending judicial review; authorizing the Board to appeal from any decision that reverses or modifies a specified order; and clarifying the circumstances under which a specified person may take a direct judicial appeal.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1A-310, 1A-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM