Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Waldstreicher, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Cluster, Conaway, S. Howard, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Moon, Rey, Sydnor, B. Wilson, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Campos, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hill, Impallaria, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Morales, Oaks, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a firefighter, an emergency medical technician, a rescue squad member, or any other first responder engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services; and applying specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1183 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642319/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {808571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {642319/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {808571/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM