Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Ebersole, Hill, Miller, Pendergrass, Shetty, and Terrasa
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to provide a county superintendent of schools, if the State Superintendent plans to remove the county superintendent, with the reason for removal, documentation supporting the case for removal, and the opportunity to request a hearing within 10 days; authorizing a county board of education to remove a county superintendent in a certain manner; and authorizing a county superintendent to appeal a certain decision by the county board to the State Board of Education.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0747
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695364/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {203427/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-3)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {695364/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Lam) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {203427/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-3) 60
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text - Chapter - Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM