Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, K. Kelly, Lee, McComas, Rosenberg, Smigiel, F. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Court of Appeals to allow an applicant to the Bar or a lawyer to use a credit or debit card to pay specified fees; and authorizing the Court of Appeals to charge a processing fee for each credit or debit card payment not exceeding the actual cost incurred in processing the credit or debit card payment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM