Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing each county and the Department of the Environment to adopt a specified solid waste management hierarchy; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the State undertake specified actions relating to recycling and landfill disposal rates; establishing the Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force; requiring the Task Force to determine the statewide recycling goal and a recycling and landfill portfolio standard that will reduce the amount of solid waste being sent to landfills; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0056
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0799 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533497/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {443422/1
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {443422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Lafferty) {873624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (80-56)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {533497/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {443422/1 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 36
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {443422/1 Adopted 37
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Lafferty) {873624/1 Adopted 37
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (80-56) 40
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM