Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Hershey, and Smigiel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the application of specified provisions of law relating to the protection of agricultural operations from nuisance actions under specified circumstances to apply to specified commercial fishing and seafood operations; exempting specified commercial fishing and seafood operations from nuisance lawsuits; authorizing an appeal of a local agency's decision on a nuisance complaint against a commercial fishing or seafood operation to a circuit court; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0163
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0915 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM