Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Event Licenses and Promoter's License
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an applicant in Frederick County to purchase specified single-day or multiday alcoholic beverages licenses; specifying the licenses may be issued for a maximum of 50 days to a single applicant in a calendar year; providing for specified license fees; establishing a promoter's license in the County; requiring a for-profit organization to obtain a promoter's license from the Board of License Commissioners before the organization may conduct specified activities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0502
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM