Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Participation Goal
Sponsored by
Delegates Carozza, Holmes, McMillan, O'Donnell, C. Wilson, P. Young, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the participation goal from 0.5% to 1% for specified veteran-owned small business enterprises for specified procurement contracts.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {886180/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {886180/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM