Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Smith, Lierman, B. Robinson, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Glenn, Hixson, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Proctor, Rosenberg, Turner, Valentino-Smith, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to shieldable convictions no earlier than 3 years after the person satisfies the sentence or sentences imposed for all convictions for which shielding is requested; providing that, if a person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction or convictions are not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; providing that shielded records remain accessible to specified entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0526
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1056 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {752910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {843820/2 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {663629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {693229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {523920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {493221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (81-56)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {752910/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 63
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {843820/2 Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {663629/1 Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {693229/1 Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {523920/1 Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {493221/1 Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (81-56) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Anderson) {493221/01 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Anderson) {523920/01 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Folden) {573127/01 Rejected
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Anderson) {663629/01 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Anderson) {693229/01 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate McConkey) {723521/01 Rejected
4/08/2015 Amendments House - (Judiciary) {752910/01 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Buckel) {843820/02 Adopted
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Howard, S.) {853723/01 Rejected
4/10/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate McConkey) {853823/01 Rejected
2/03/2015 Text - First - Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
4/10/2015 Text - Third - Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
5/18/2015 Text - Chapter - Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
4/08/2015 Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
4/13/2015 Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folden) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78) - 04/04/15
4/04/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Howard) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78) - 04/04/15
4/04/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81) - 04/04/15
4/04/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90) - 04/04/15
4/06/2015 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-56) - 04/06/15
4/08/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) - 04/08/15
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM