Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell, Barron, Frick, Healey, Korman, McCray, Patterson, Sanchez, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a victim of a robbery whose driver's license is taken during the robbery to drive without a license for 2 weeks under specified circumstances; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery, to process the victim's application on an expedited basis and give the application precedence over other applications for duplicate licenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1163
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0009 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-112, 16-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM