Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Ali, Anderson, Conaway, Dumais, Gibson, Glenn, Kelly, Moon, Morhaim, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from threatening to commit certain hate crimes; applying and altering certain penalties; and authorizing a court to require a certain person to attend certain educational classes and perform certain community service as a condition of supervised release.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-302 through 10-306, 10-302.1, 10-303.1, 10-304.1, 10-305.1, 10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM