Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reorganizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation and the State Collection Agency Licensing Board as divisions of the Maryland Insurance Administration instead of units in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that the Board is in the Financial Regulation Division of the Administration; requiring the Board to delegate the processing of specified license applications and license renewal applications to the Division; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-206, 1-207, 1-209, 2-108, 7-201, 7-204, 7-205, 7-207, 7-303, 7-306 )
(   10-120, 1-101, 11-209, 11-409, 12-802 through 12-804, 12-805, 12-806, 2-101, 2-102 through 2-105, 2-111 through 2-113, 2-401, 3-212, 3-704, 4-701, 4-802, 4-907, 5-801, 5-802, 6-713, 6-907, 6-908 )
(   1-202, 2-102.1, 2-103, 2-105 )
(   14-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM