Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the concurrent jurisdiction of the District Court and a circuit court in a criminal case in which the person is charged with certain subsequent alcohol- or drug-related driving offenses.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent Jurisdiction
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM