Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voting Coordinators
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Acevero, Barron, D.M. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Ivey, Jackson, Moon, Mosby, Queen, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each correctional facility to designate an employee to act as the correctional facility's voting coordinator; providing the purpose of the coordinator is to facilitate voter registration and voting by eligible detainees by informing eligible detainees of upcoming elections, the dissemination of eligibility requirements and voter registration applications, and the transmission of certain applications and ballots between eligible detainees and the local boards of elections; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0936
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0542 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395468/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/12 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {923120/2 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (41-95)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate Corderman) Rejected (39-97)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voting Coordinators
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {395468/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/12 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 43
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {923120/2 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (41-95) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate Corderman) Rejected (39-97) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voting Coordinators
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings 46A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM