Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under specified circumstances for golf carts in the City of Crisfield; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the City of Crisfield may operate the golf cart only on specified roads at specified times and only if the golf cart is equipped with specified lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the City of Crisfield to keep as far to the right of the roadway as feasible and possess a valid driver's license; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0309
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1166 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340716/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {340716/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-402, 21-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM