Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education Units
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and Saab
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements to renew specified licenses by authorizing specified registered nurses and licensed practical nurses to renew a license if the registered nurse or licensed practical nurse submits to the State Board of Nursing specified evidence of completion of a specified number of continuing education units as required by regulations adopted by the Board.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education Units
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education Units
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text - Chapter - State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education Units
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM