Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegate Hixson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing participating secondary schools to serve breakfast in any part of the school, including from "Grab and Go" carts; and clarifying when breakfast in the classroom should be served.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0359
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text - Chapter - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM