Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Contract Review
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Aging to conduct a certain review of certain contracts that the Department of Aging requires area agencies to enter into and make certain recommendations; requiring the Secretary to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; and terminating the Act after May 31, 2020.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Aging - Contract Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Aging - Contract Review
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM