Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Minority Business Enterprise Programs - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Glenn, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the board of trustees of specified community colleges to conduct specified studies on or before a specified date; requiring the board of trustees of specified community colleges to establish a minority business enterprise program if a specified study demonstrates a specified compelling interest; requiring the board of trustees of specified community colleges to comply with specified requirements in conducting a specified study and adopting a specified minority business enterprise program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM