Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, Conaway, Dumais, Moon, Queen, Sanchez, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of an adult entertainment establishment to post the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information sign in each restroom of the adult entertainment establishment in a specified manner; requiring a specified agency that determines a specified violation has occurred to notify the owner of the adult entertainment establishment or the owner's agent of the violation; providing a maximum civil penalty of $1,000 for each restroom without the specified notification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {983920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {983920/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {118273/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 60
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Conference Committee Report {983920/1 Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 70
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {983920/1 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 19-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM