Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Clippinger, Hammen, and McHale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to provide that a specified grant for the Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum may not terminate before June 1, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1521 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: The prior authorization was altered during the 2014 Session and was amended into the Capital Budget Bill (SB 171 ).
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2005, 2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM