Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain persons to submit to the Public Service Commission beginning July 1, 2021, monthly reports containing information on the supply of electricity and gas to certain residential customers; requiring certain initial reports to include information from the previous 12 months; providing for the required contents of each report; requiring certain information to be organized by low-income customers and all other customers; requiring the Commission to make each report available to certain persons; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0686
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633491/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {633491/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page