Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Historically and Architecturally Valuable Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 10% to 25%, the amount of restoration and preservation expenses for specified historic structures that the governing body of a county or municipal corporation may authorize to be claimed by specified taxpayers as a property tax credit against the county or municipal property tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM