Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Moon, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; and altering the purposes of certain provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System to include provision for the rights of victims and victims' representatives to receive information to the extent practicable in accordance with certain standards developed by the United States Department of Justice.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0180
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1525 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {812913/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {812913/1 Adopted 26
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 10-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM