Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual, except under specified circumstances, to be registered by the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists before practicing psychology as a psychology associate in the State; specifying the circumstances under which a registered psychology associate is authorized to practice psychology in the State; requiring an individual to meet specified requirements to qualify for registration as a psychology associate; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0345
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {986687/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-202, 18-206, 18-301, 18-302, 18-303, 18-304, 18-306, 18-307, 18-308 through 18-313, 18-313.1, 18-314, 18-316, 18-317, 18-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM