Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office - Public Official
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Anderson, Conaway, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, for the purpose of the common law crime of misconduct in office, a public official includes a person employed in the executive service or management service of the Executive Branch of State government.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office - Public Official
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office - Public Official
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM