Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Campos, Chang, Hettleman, Hornberger, C. Howard, Sophocleus, B. Wilson, Angel, Frick, Haynes, Krebs, Patterson, Platt, Smith, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program; providing for the composition of the Task Force, including one representative each from the Public School Superintendents Association of Maryland, the Maryland State Education Association, and the Maryland School Psychologists' Association; requiring the Task Force to study specified matters and to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 30, 2015, to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0015
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795262/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364933/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {795262/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {364933/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM