Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain homebuyer education requirements for a loan recipient in the Down Payment and Settlement Expense Loan Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; allowing a loan recipient to use the online homebuyer education for a HUD-approved product and contact a HUD-approved agency for a certificate; providing that certain provisions do not alter or preempt the authority of a political subdivision to establish homebuyer education or counseling requirements for down payment assistance; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0106 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Rules 33
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-302, 4-308, 4-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM