Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a specified petition for expungement of specified juvenile records; authorizing the court to order the expungement of a specified record under specified circumstances; requiring the court to consider specified criteria in its consideration of a specified petition for expungement of records; authorizing the court to rule on a petition for expungement with or without a hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {992217/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-27)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {992217/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (111-27) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM