Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, M. Washington, Brooks, Barron, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Healey, Lafferty, Lierman, Patterson, B. Robinson, Stein, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to certify annually the amount of assessable base for real property located in a specified development district; applying the Act to the calculation of payment of State education aid to counties and Baltimore City for fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2017; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that specified recommendations regarding education funding shall consider the impact of economic development incentives in low wealth jurisdictions on State education aid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0455
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414964/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {414964/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM