Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Barve, and Gilchrist
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a limitation on the authority of certain municipalities to impose a hotel rental tax on hotels with 10 or fewer sleeping rooms.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0466
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-17)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted (39-6)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-17) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 33
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted (39-6) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text - Chapter - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM