Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Barkley, Bromwell, Carr, Cullison, Frush, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Patterson, Platt, Smith, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a medical school from using a live or dead animal in the medical education or training of students if alternate methods are used by specified other medical schools in the State; and establishing a penalty for violation of the Act not to exceed $1,000 for each animal used.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0990
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1248 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page