Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a manufacturer, distributor, factory branch, or affiliate from requiring, attempting to require, coercing, or attempting to coerce a dealer to purchase specified goods or services from specified vendors under specified circumstances; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch licensed in the State to specify in writing to its motor vehicle dealers specified information relating to the compensation of dealers for parts and labor; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
(   15-207, 15-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page