Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain health insurance carriers to provide to the policyholder or plan sponsor of a group health benefit plan a renewal premium rate calculation statement at least 90 days before the date of renewal of the group health benefit plan; altering the definition of "large employer" for certain disclosure purposes to mean an employer that, during the immediately preceding calendar year, employed an average of more than 50 employees; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1408, 15-1411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM