Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, B. Wilson, Anderson, Atterbeary, Fennell, Hettleman, Kittleman, McComas, Moon, Morhaim, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, and Tarlau
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include a case in which a person received probation before judgment for assault in the second degree if the crime was a specified domestically related crime.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-46)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-17)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-46) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 56
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 58
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (27-17) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM