Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the duty of an employee organization certified as the exclusive representative of certain employees of the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County to represent all employees in a certain bargaining unit in a certain manner; authorizing the exclusive representative to require an employee who does not pay certain dues or fees to pay certain costs and fees for filing a certain grievance or arbitrating a certain matter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations 16
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM