Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists by extending to July 1, 2026, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; repealing the requirement that the Board submit a certain semiannual report to the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Board to submit a report on the progress made implementing certain recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2020, and every 6 months thereafter until October 1, 2025: etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 158
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 158
Text - Chapter - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page