Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that annuity contracts purchased under the optional retirement program shall be issued to and become the property of participating employees of the program; clarifying that the rights of participating employees who purchase annuity contracts under the program are fully vested and not subject to forfeit; authorizing a participating employee in the optional retirement program to select specified annuity contracts for the transfer of existing balances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0353
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {249335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {524766/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {249335/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   30-101, 30-206, 30-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM