Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, S. Robinson, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from using specified technology to monitor the behavior or shopping habits of a consumer unless the merchant provides a specified notice in a specified manner; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to specified enforcement and penalty provisions; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1094 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM