Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Simmons, Anderson, Arora, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Glenn, Hixson, Jones, Kaiser, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Reznik, Rosenberg, Swain, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Zucker, and Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime of violence when the person knows or reasonably should know that a minor who is at least 2 years old is present in a residence; establishing a specified circumstance under which a minor is present; establishing an enhanced penalty for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to impose an enhanced penalty if the State's Attorney provides specified notice to the defendant in a specified manner and if specified elements have been proven beyond a reasonable doubt; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0337
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {932314/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Arora) Withdrawn
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {932314/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Arora) Withdrawn 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM