Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Barron, Cluster, Folden, Hixson, Holmes, Jackson, Kipke, Luedtke, Metzgar, Vogt, Waldstreicher, B. Wilson, P. Young, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Impallaria, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employers to grant a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans who have service-connected disabilities, and surviving spouses of deceased eligible veterans; providing that granting a preference under the Act does not violate State or local equal employment opportunity laws; and defining the term "eligible veteran".
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203590/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {627679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
House Refuses Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Reilly
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Delegates C. Wilson, Brooks, and S. Howard
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {203590/1 Report Adopted 21
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 25
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Finance 25
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {627679/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 55
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 House Refuses Concur - Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Reilly 60
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Delegates C. Wilson, Brooks, and S. Howard 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 71
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM