Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment
Sponsored by
Delegates Norman, Anderson, Braveboy, Cardin, Clippinger, Cluster, Dumais, Eckardt, Feldman, Frank, George, Ivey, Jacobs, James, K. Kelly, Krebs, Lafferty, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, Mitchell, Niemann, Otto, Reznik, Simmons, Smigiel, Stein, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a judgment creditor to obtain discovery in aid of enforcement of a money judgment entered or recorded in a circuit court or in the District Court by use of a court ordered examination under oath before a judge or examiner of a judgment debtor or any other person deemed by the court likely to possess or have knowledge of assets subject to execution; and establishing timing, notice, and procedural requirements for court ordered examinations in aid of enforcement of a money judgment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0337 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 35
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM