Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Clippinger, Glenn, Harper, McHale, McIntosh, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Stukes, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court, on request of the State's Attorney, to make a finding as to whether a crime for which a defendant is convicted or receives a probation before judgment disposition is a gang-related crime; establishing that the State has the burden of proving by a preponderance of the evidence that a crime is a gang-related crime; requiring a finding by the court that a crime is a gang-related crime to become part of the court record for purposes of reporting to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0265
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-215, 6-234 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM