Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified licensees or employees of the licensees give immediate access to specified members or employees of the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors for purposes of conducting specified inspections; requiring the Board to provide the results of an inspection to specified licensees within 24 hours after completion of an inspection; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0357
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM