Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Glenn, Mitchell, B. Robinson, Stukes, and Tarrant
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement for the Comptroller to withhold Maryland income tax refunds from specified individuals with outstanding warrants to include residents of Baltimore City or individuals who have outstanding warrants from Baltimore City; and terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-14)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-14) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937 through 13-940 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM