Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages License Applications - Repeal of Petition of Support - Notice
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing in Frederick County the requirement that certain real estate owners within 5,000 feet of an establishment for which a license is sought sign a petition of support for the license application; repealing the provision of law providing for selecting other persons to sign the petition under certain circumstances; requiring an applicant for a license to post a certain notice at the location described in the application for at least 14 days before the application hearing; and specifying the contents of the notice.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages License Applications - Repeal of Petition of Support - Notice
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages License Applications - Repeal of Petition of Support - Notice
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages License Applications - Repeal of Petition of Support - Notice
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-102, 20-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM