Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Ali, Angel, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jones, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, P. Young, Jalisi, Sophocleus, and Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; authorizing a nonpublic school that participates in the Federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program to participate in the State free feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing certain nonpublic schools; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing a county board or a participating nonpublic school for the student share of costs; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0288 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905760/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-20)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {829936/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-20)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {905760/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (118-20) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {829936/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (117-20) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-601 through 7-605, 7-701 through 7-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM