Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Barron, Beitzel, Cluster, Ebersole, Lafferty, Mautz, Metzgar, Stein, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under specified circumstances, a pharmacist to dispense drugs that contain substances listed in Schedule II, Schedule III, Schedule IV, or Schedule V in lockable vials; authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Board to create and make available to pharmacists a statement that educates patients on the potential for abuse and diversion of drugs that contain specified controlled dangerous substances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0428
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM