Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each unit in the Executive Branch, on or before December 31, 2019, and every 4 years thereafter, to revise certain written policies for public communications, submit the revised policies to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review, and post the revised policies on the unit's website in a conspicuous place.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-801, 10-802, 10-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM